OPEN DOOR EXMOUTH

Charity number: 1094599
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £152.99k £164.34k £191.07k £219.17k £273.78k
Total expenditure £171.79k £168.73k £191.45k £202.31k £264.17k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £4.00k £23.90k £46.43k