BOSLEY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1094545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 February 2021 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required