ST MARY'S THURSDAY CLUB

Charity number: 1095432
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 27 April 2020 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 26 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 13 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 30 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required