ASYLUM SUPPORT & IMMIGRATION RESOURCE TEAM

Charity number: 1098544
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 June 2019 148 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Annual return 31 March 2016 27 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 27 January 2017 On time