BRIGG WHEELERS

Charity number: 1110422
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2019 15 October 2020 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2018 28 February 2020 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2017 06 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2016 28 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2015 07 December 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2015 Not Required