AFRICAN FAMILIES FOCUS AND RELIEF ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1097868
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £9.25k £9.72k £9.85k £9.91k £21.70k
Total expenditure £9.15k £9.61k £9.65k £9.66k £21.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £20.00k