FRIENDS OF ST JOHNS SCHOOL

Charity number: 1094714
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £17.51k £14.07k £17.07k £12.96k £12.89k
Total expenditure £11.03k £15.76k £11.16k £3.97k £14.28k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A