ASHLEY DOWN SCHOOLS PARENT STAFF ASSOC

Charity number: 1096007
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £19.46k £14.86k £21.40k £14.60k £15.85k
Total expenditure £6.16k £24.27k £24.64k £15.21k £11.15k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A