"ASHRAM" - LAMBETH ASIAN ELDERLY DAYCENTRE

Charity number: 1097364
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £8.32k £8.77k £7.54k £7.19k £4.52k
Total expenditure £4.47k £4.14k £7.32k £4.91k £4.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A