Financial history SEREN FFESTINIOG CYF.

Charity number: 1108461
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.50m £1.54m £1.52m £1.77m £1.73m
Total expenditure £1.48m £1.54m £1.57m £1.92m £1.60m
Income from government contracts £908.02k £880.18k £932.94k £1.17m £1.10m
Income from government grants £0 £12.58k £25.00k N/A £287.51k
Income - Donations and legacies £38.24k £26.86k £35.70k £15.80k £35.39k
Income - Other trading activities £513.96k £589.13k £521.08k £547.72k £286.56k
Income - Charitable activities £941.67k £923.69k £949.12k £1.19m £1.32m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5 £13 £46 £88 £32
Income - Other £3.05k £630 £10.14k £18.34k £89.38k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.22m £1.27m £1.33m £1.49m £1.47m
Expenditure - Raising funds £206.74k £227.40k £193.30k £257.91k £97.84k
Expenditure - Governance £15.11k £16.31k £30.01k £21.61k £19.51k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £54.96k £44.49k £47.59k £178.83k £37.30k