Financial history THE TEMPLE MUSIC FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1095141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £306.93k £198.69k £311.02k £321.08k £210.91k
Total expenditure £308.36k £190.02k £285.85k £286.07k £227.20k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A