FRIENDS OF ST CUTHBERTS INFANTS SCHOOL

Charity number: 1095062
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 21 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 21 January 2020 205 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 29 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 06 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required