FRIENDS OF ST CUTHBERTS INFANTS SCHOOL

Charity number: 1095062
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £1.62k £3.51k £5.59k £8.16k £7.70k
Total expenditure £2.44k £1.87k £3.55k £6.87k £5.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A