ST GILES CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1094965
Charity reporting is overdue by 51 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 51 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 51 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 19 March 2021 232 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 19 March 2021 598 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 11 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 28 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required