THE CAVENDISH TRUST

Charity number: 1095445
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 21 February 2021 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 06 April 2020 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 08 May 2019 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 04 April 2018 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 04 April 2018 58 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 05 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 05 February 2017 On time Download