THE CAVENDISH TRUST

Charity number: 1095445
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £176.37k £190.10k £0 £7.99k £0
Total expenditure £175.81k £231.66k £640 £131 £8.43k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A