COMPASSION IN WORLD FARMING INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1095050
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £8.06m £9.68m £7.90m £11.57m £12.43m
Total expenditure £6.98m £8.25m £10.05m £11.27m £10.25m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £129.92k
Income - Donations and legacies £7.79m £9.32m £7.62m £11.29m £12.18m
Income - Other trading activities £106.98k £183.02k £121.83k £133.82k £152.45k
Income - Charitable activities £17.38k £23.14k £4.81k £8.21k £5.35k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £136.62k £145.04k £146.29k £137.42k £85.74k
Income - Other £7.46k £7.46k £7.46k £7.46k £7.46k
Income - Legacies £2.34m £2.65m £2.46m £2.78m £4.20m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.88m £6.44m £7.73m £8.00m £7.47m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.10m £1.81m £2.32m £3.27m £2.78m
Expenditure - Governance £122.14k £71.69k £85.02k £70.86k £110.77k
Expenditure - Grants institution £78.30k £83.64k £176.31k £116.01k £158.31k
Expenditure - Investment management £37.77k £40.92k £61.66k £43.35k £39.55k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0