UK PAKISTAN WELFARE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1098906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.65k £2.37k £750 £872 £575
Total expenditure £1.90k £2.37k £630 £871 £575
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A