Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ST. NICHOLAS CHAPEL, KING'S LYNN

Charity number: 1099693
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 01 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required