Financial history BOD SILIN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1095327
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.54k £2.04k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.01k £2.05k £461 £467 £486
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A