Financial history SHEKINAH MISSION (PLYMOUTH) LIMITED

Charity number: 1097409
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.23m £1.36m £1.45m £1.81m £2.14m
Total expenditure £1.11m £1.24m £1.46m £1.72m £1.78m
Income from government contracts £23.00k £142.19k £491.09k £821.76k £1.01m
Income from government grants £0 £124.14k £17.42k £53.71k £331.14k
Income - Donations and legacies £355.23k £329.66k £265.33k £271.44k £471.07k
Income - Other trading activities £49.64k £48.06k £57.19k £69.98k £119.48k
Income - Charitable activities £827.41k £983.20k £1.13m £1.47m £1.55m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £87 £519 £776 £233
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £83.06k £41.99k £4.00k £0 £5.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.03m £1.17m £1.40m £1.70m £1.76m
Expenditure - Raising funds £76.60k £73.58k £65.31k £19.86k £15.16k
Expenditure - Governance £47.85k £48.75k £8.36k £8.74k £9.13k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £379 £103 £91