ISLES OF SCILLY WILDLIFE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1097807
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £429.44k £276.90k £567.93k £445.09k £667.33k
Total expenditure £305.41k £320.25k £436.42k £393.22k £417.13k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £292.93k £238.52k £406.78k £289.20k £175.90k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £45.25k N/A £423.31k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A £11.69k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £489.72k N/A £228.32k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £2.95k N/A £4.00k
Income - Other N/A N/A £30.01k N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £17.00k N/A £355.44k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £418.79k N/A £363.29k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £17.63k N/A £53.85k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £1.19k N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0