ISLES OF SCILLY WILDLIFE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1097807
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID APPLETON Trustee 28 September 2017 None on record
Rosemary Teverson Trustee 11 September 2015 None on record
Rebecca Mary Kaye Trustee 21 March 2019 None on record
STEVE MANNING Trustee None on record
Andrew Thomas Whitehouse Trustee 07 March 2019 None on record
Neil Pilkington Jones Chair 11 March 2019
PILKINGTON CHARITIES FUND Received: On time
THE GENERAL CHARITY FUND Received: On time
Barry Archer Trustee 11 September 2015 None on record