EUROPEAN VENOUS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1100372
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £66.81k £149.51k £138.51k £65.00k £45.06k
Total expenditure £5.70k £6.55k £32.75k £76.13k £31.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A