Accounts and annual returns WIMBORNE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity number: 1096535
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 15 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 21 March 2021 264 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 21 March 2021 264 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 14 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 18 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window