Accounts and annual returns DICKENS HEATH VILLAGE CHURCH
Charity number: 1095537
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 July 2019 | 19 October 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 July 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 30 March 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | 30 March 2019 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 03 May 2018 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | 05 June 2018 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 18 April 2017 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | 05 May 2017 | On time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window