NATIONAL GROCERS BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 1095897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 02 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 04 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 29 August 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 19 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 19 August 2016 On time Download