Trustees THE PUBLIC CATALOGUE FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1096185

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathleen SORIANO | Chair | 23 October 2020 |
|
|||||
John Frederick STACK | Trustee | 08 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Gwyn DAVIES | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Cuerden | Trustee | 16 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine HOLDEN | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Professor Carola BOEHM | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Errol FRANCIS | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hasan BAKHSHI | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas MARKS | Trustee | 14 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
KIMBERLEY Jane STREETS | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|||||
CLARE L LILLEY | Trustee | 17 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE EDWARD ENTWISTLE | Trustee | 22 April 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.