REACHOUT YOUTH

Charity number: 1096492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £625.78k £668.51k £892.17k £964.16k £999.00k
Total expenditure £603.43k £532.12k £908.39k £873.82k £983.91k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k £18.16k £18.16k £107.57k £81.89k
Income - Donations and legacies £315.17k £287.11k £345.08k £369.76k £539.41k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £54.57k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £310.61k £381.30k £492.46k £593.96k £459.08k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £105 £56 £437 £519
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £546.01k £470.27k £625.74k £723.14k £773.34k
Expenditure - Raising funds £57.42k £61.85k £115.84k £150.68k £210.57k
Expenditure - Governance £6.41k £6.41k £7.17k £7.61k £12.05k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £166.81k £0 £0