Financial history THE GARAGE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1098975
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £854.77k £868.77k £1.04m £857.14k £1.10m
Total expenditure £846.29k £902.60k £997.33k £825.53k £1.05m
Income from government contracts £26.20k £20.64k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £31.22k £223.10k £178.60k
Income - Donations and legacies £56.11k £18.22k £51.60k £30.99k £24.98k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £798.38k £849.73k £984.60k £819.10k £1.07m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £279 £821 £1.05k £7.05k £8.11k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £839.92k £895.69k £989.69k £817.18k £1.04m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £6.37k £6.90k £7.64k £8.34k £9.12k