THE ST NEOTS & DISTRICT U3A

Charity number: 1096143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Alan Jarrett Trustee
THE PIGHTLE MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST Received: On time
EATONS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Yvonne Grace Trustee 17 September 2019 None on record
Mavis Thompson Trustee 15 September 2015 None on record
Jill Elizabeth Major Trustee 17 September 2019
FRIENDS OF PAXTON PITS NATURE RESERVE Received: On time
Ian Richardson Trustee 18 September 2018 None on record
Dorothy Morfett Trustee 17 September 2019 None on record
Sarahjane Williams Trustee 15 September 2020 None on record
ANTHONY THOMAS GORDON SUMMERLIN Trustee 09 January 2017 None on record
Ann Margaret Ferguson Trustee 17 September 2019 None on record
Roger Worden Trustee 19 September 2017 None on record