Accounts and annual returns CALLINGTON TOWN BAND

Charity number: 1096165
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 30 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 02 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 01 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 03 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 04 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required