SOUTH OF ENGLAND FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1096222
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £2.28m £2.26m £2.08m £2.29m £2.29m
Income from government grants £1.19m £210.73k £155.00k £240.00k £240.00k
Other income £2.04m £4.48m £3.20m £2.75m £3.04m
Total expenditure £5.83m £5.57m £5.45m £5.59m £6.02m