Accounts and annual returns AFRICA'S FUTURE
Charity number: 1098660
Charity reporting is overdue by 128 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 22 January 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 128 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 January 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 128 days | |
Annual return | 22 January 2022 | 14 October 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 22 January 2021 | 14 October 2022 | 326 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 22 January 2020 | 01 April 2021 | 130 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 January 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 22 January 2019 | 13 January 2020 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 January 2019 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window