Financial history AFRICA'S FUTURE

Charity number: 1098660
Charity reporting is overdue by 315 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 22/01/2016 22/01/2017 22/01/2018 22/01/2019 22/01/2020
Total gross income £1.70k £1.74k £1.57k £1.52k £1.71k
Total expenditure £830 £2.49k £1.29k £655 £1.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A