EVERTON IN THE COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1099366
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £3.06m £4.39m £4.22m £5.18m £5.84m
Total expenditure £2.50m £3.07m £3.54m £4.17m £4.63m
Income from government contracts £209.81k £545.69k £716.39k £1.19m £902.31k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £285.87k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.45m £2.24m £1.57m £1.80m £2.47m
Income - Other trading activities £211.70k £115.80k £413.77k £461.06k £357.40k
Income - Charitable activities £404.67k £2.03m £2.24m £2.92m £3.01m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £668 £0 £0 £500 £2.46k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £400.00k £0 £15.82k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.19m £2.77m £3.17m £3.60m £4.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £306.88k £298.13k £366.73k £565.77k £521.70k
Expenditure - Governance £41.04k £41.57k £17.35k £68.52k £145.70k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0