Accounts and annual returns ST IPPOLYTS SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1100833
Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 95 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 95 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 16 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 16 November 2020 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 07 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 29 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required