GROUNDWORK WALES

Charity number: 1096662
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Linda Barry Trustee 27 August 2020 None on record
Karen Heenan-Davies Trustee 05 December 2018
GROUNDWORK CAERPHILLY Received: On time
Derek Havard Trustee 28 February 2018
THE MONMOUTHSHIRE FARM SCHOOL ENDOWMENT Received: On time
GROUNDWORK CAERPHILLY Received: On time
Jeff Greenidge Chair 09 February 2018
GWENT BALLET THEATRE LIMITED Received: On time
Ufi VocTech Trust Received: On time
NATIONAL LEARNING AND WORK INSTITUTE Received: On time
Natalie Reees Trustee 11 March 2016 None on record
Bivin Mathew Trustee 11 March 2016 None on record
Phil Fiander Trustee 10 December 2018
GROUNDWORK CAERPHILLY Received: On time
Paul Robinson Trustee 10 September 2020 None on record