Trustees FAMILY REFUGEE SUPPORT PROJECT

Charity number: 1098825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ERIC PETER FELL Chair 20 May 2019
FOUNDATION FOR SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY AND CIVILISATION UK
Overdue by 45 days
Emily Ross Trustee 05 February 2024
SOUTH LIVERPOOL VINEYARD CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP
Received: 52 days late
Dr Kit Oi Chung Trustee 17 November 2022
None on record
Ruth Alice Buchanan Trustee 21 October 2021
None on record
Deborah Jane Gordon Trustee 05 November 2020
None on record
Dr HELEN MARGARET McKENDRICK Trustee 24 May 2018
None on record
KAREN JONASON Trustee 23 June 2015
None on record
ROBERT LESLIE WAUGH Trustee 17 September 2011
None on record