ZNANIYE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1101796
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/05/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £12.10k £38.12k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £2.44k £34.25k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £2.50k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £2.50k