Toddington St Georges PTA

Charity number: 1097247
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £22.94k £12.81k £10.15k £19.98k £5.98k
Total expenditure £12.38k £8.01k £9.39k £19.54k £5.04k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £250 N/A