Financial history FRIENDS AND RELATIVES OF CALVELEY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1096658
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £10.42k £7.53k £6.49k £1.59k £3.80k
Total expenditure £10.67k £7.44k £7.78k £5.45k £1.77k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A