Accounts and annual returns BEAP

Charity number: 1098088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 05 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 February 2019 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 22 February 2019 22 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 29 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window