BLUE VENTURES CONSERVATION

Charity number: 1098893
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019
Total gross income £1.90m £2.24m £3.01m £4.03m £6.28m
Total expenditure £1.27m £1.62m £2.29m £4.13m £5.28m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £223.18k £178.95k £926.51k £1.37m £1.74m
Income - Donations and legacies £1.83m £2.16m £2.97m £98.48k £110.81k
Income - Other trading activities £16.26k £13.05k £3.90k £417.13k £434.25k
Income - Charitable activities £49.53k £32.02k £32.00k £3.51m £5.74m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.99k £2.32k £3.29k £1.27k £459
Income - Other £0 £29.24k £12 £2.53k £5
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.19m £1.56m £2.21m £3.42m £5.10m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £58.73k £77.63k £161.34k £173.52k
Expenditure - Governance £20.00k £9.77k £26.91k £30.08k £41.02k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £211.10k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £546.78k £0