100 BLACK MEN OF LONDON

Charity number: 1105904
Charity reporting is up to date (25 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 February 2021 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 February 2021 25 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 February 2018 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 27 February 2018 27 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 29 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required