Accounts and annual returns PERSONA DOLL TRAINING

Charity number: 1099315
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 20 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required