Financial history PERSONA DOLL TRAINING

Charity number: 1099315
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £15.31k £24.33k £47.81k £19.16k £39.87k
Total expenditure £26.85k £34.72k £36.56k £28.09k £32.27k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A