Financial history EPSOM MALE VOICE CHOIR

Charity number: 1097085
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £12.37k £11.20k £14.69k £10.78k £10.04k
Total expenditure £11.38k £10.89k £14.69k £6.60k £8.53k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A