Trustees EPSOM MALE VOICE CHOIR

Charity number: 1097085
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Roderick O'Connor Chair 21 January 2015
ST RAPHAEL'S HOSPICE
Received: On time
Martin David Trenaman Trustee 20 January 2022
SUTTON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
THE UNITED CHURCH OF ST MARK
Received: On time
Peter Clarke Trustee 20 January 2022
None on record
Paul Noakes Trustee 20 January 2021
None on record
Frederick Evans Trustee 20 January 2021
None on record
Richard Anthony Rowe Trustee 24 January 2018
None on record
COLIN DAVIES Trustee 20 January 2016
None on record
GEORGE SELL Trustee 05 February 2014
None on record