Financial history NUFFIELD COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD

Charity number: 1137506
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £11.39m £11.11m £12.74m £12.08m £11.89m
Total expenditure £10.36m £10.61m £13.94m £12.16m £12.81m
Income from government contracts £0 £8.00k £8.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £50.00k £51.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £357.00k £193.00k £552.00k £270.00k £357.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.77m £1.89m £1.97m £1.81m £1.39m
Income - Endowments £341.00k £188.00k £539.00k £268.00k £354.00k
Income - Investment £9.61m £9.21m £10.76m £10.09m £10.45m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £176.00k £51.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.26m £8.46m £10.69m £9.10m £9.26m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.10m £2.15m £3.25m £3.05m £3.55m
Expenditure - Governance £19.00k £20.00k £19.00k £19.00k £19.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £3.00k £4.00k £3.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £1.92m £1.93m £2.99m £2.83m £3.31m
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0